+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 251
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper