+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 17
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper