+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 160
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper