+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper