+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Act 98
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2021: Senate Vote #94 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
February 16, 2021: House Vote #42 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 162
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor