+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor