+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 13, 2022 in the House:
- Act 873
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Postponed
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2022: House Vote #838 Agree to Senate Substitute
- Yeas: 149
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 25
March 8, 2022: Senate Vote #600 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 54
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2021: House Vote #76 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 167
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 8