+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On July 29, 2020 in the House:
- Act 489
- House Date Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper