+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Act 148
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper