+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 19
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper