+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 86
- House Date Signed by Governor
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper