+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Act 26
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper