+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Act 143
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper