+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper