+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 1
- House Date Signed by Governor
- House Sent to Governor
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor