+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 13
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor