+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper