+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Second Readers
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper