+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Act 44
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper