+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Act 82
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor