+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Vote
March 8, 2021: House Vote #218 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 51
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 5