+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper