+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 18
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper