+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper