+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 127
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper