+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
- House Reconsidered
- House Third Reading Lost
- House Third Readers
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper