+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Act 228
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper