+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 40th, 4th
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 175th, 116th
- House Insisted
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- Senate Recommitted
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper