+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Engrossed
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper