+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 22
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper