+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 41
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor