+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Act 30
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper