+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper