+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Act 189
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Third Read
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper