+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 63
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor