+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Act 595
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2022: Senate Vote #718 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
March 23, 2022: House Vote #762 Supplemental Local Calendar
- Yeas: 152
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor