+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 883
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2022: House Vote #831 Supplemental Local Calendar
- Yeas: 152
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 15
April 1, 2022: Senate Vote #775 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
March 23, 2022: House Vote #762 Supplemental Local Calendar
- Yeas: 152
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 11