+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 733
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2022: Senate Vote #744 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 23, 2022: House Vote #762 Supplemental Local Calendar
- Yeas: 152
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 11