+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Act 76
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper