+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 783
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2022: Senate Vote #764 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 11, 2022: House Vote #656 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 158
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 19