+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 13, 2022 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 881
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2022: House Vote #916 Agree to Senate Substitute
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 17
April 4, 2022: Senate Vote #835 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 15, 2022: House Vote #745 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 160
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 12