+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 779
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2022: Senate Vote #850 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2022: House Vote #720 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 172
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5