+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 588
- House Date Signed by Governor
- House Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2022: Senate Vote #802 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
March 15, 2022: House Vote #724 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 152
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 15