+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Act 833
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2022: Senate Vote #793 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2022: House Vote #598 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 165
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 13