+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Vote
February 17, 2021: House Vote #55 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 63
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 11