+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 493
- House Date Signed by Governor
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2022: Senate Vote #507 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2022: House Vote #501 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 147
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor