+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper