+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Act 34
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Senate Vote #238 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2021: House Vote #83 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 163
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 9