+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Vote
March 15, 2022: House Vote #694 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 172
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3