+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 423
- House Date Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor